This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:33:42 (UTC).

THE FRANCISCO DE LA ROSA FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 THE FRANCISCO DE LA ROSA FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1236

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HERMAN A DE LA ROSA

RENATO A DE LA ROSA

Other

THE FRANCISCO DE LA ROSA FAMILY IRREVOCABLE

Not Classified By Court

RENATO DANIEL DE LA ROSA JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THE LEGACY LAWYERS, A PROFESSIONAL CORP

10221 Slater Ave., Suite 106

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

Not Classified By Court Attorney

VEGA & RIVERA, LLP

714 West Olympic Blvd Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90015

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR AN ORDER TO TRANSFER BY MAIL/FAX ON 04/19/17 AS TO MARIO D VEGA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR AN ORDER TO TRANSFER BY MAIL/FAX ON 04/19/17 AS TO MARIO D VEGA, FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITIONERS TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITIONERS TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LOUIE A. RUIZ FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LOUIE A. RUIZ FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 07/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF NTC AND ACKNWLGMNT OF RCPT OF PET BY LOUIE RUIZ FILED.

WAIVER OF NTC AND ACKNWLGMNT OF RCPT OF PET BY LOUIE RUIZ FILED.

PETITIONERS BRIEF ON STANDING IN REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OBJECTION FILED.

PETITIONERS BRIEF ON STANDING IN REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OBJECTION FILED.

HRG OF 10/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/01/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/01/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MOTION RE: FOR AN OREDER TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING ETC SET FOR HEARING ON 05/01/17, FILED BY PETITIONER RENATO A DE LA ROSA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR AN OREDER TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING ETC SET FOR HEARING ON 05/01/17, FILED BY PETITIONER RENATO A DE LA ROSA (IMAGED)

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING BASED ON IMPROPER VENUE FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING BASED ON IMPROPER VENUE FILED.

HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST;FOR ORDER SUSPENDING AND REMOVING TRUSTEE FILED.

PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST;FOR ORDER SUSPENDING AND REMOVING TRUSTEE FILED.

HRG OF 08/15/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/15/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST FILED.

NOTICE AFTER HEARING FILED BY RENATO A DE LA ROSA, HERMAN A DE LA ROSA.

NOTICE AFTER HEARING FILED BY RENATO A DE LA ROSA, HERMAN A DE LA ROSA.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICHARD PAVLICH APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; ATTORNEY LOUIE RUIZ PRESENT FOR RENATO DANIEL DE LA ROSA JR.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; MATTER IS CONTINUED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/17/18 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • PETITION FOR DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; REPORTER WAIVED; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MATTHEW STIDHAM PRESENT FOR RENATO A. DELAROSA AND HERMAN A. DELAROSA.; ATTORNEY LOUIE RUIZ PRESENT FOR RENATO DANIEL DELAROSA JR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); REPORTER WAIVED; COUNSEL INDICATE THAT THEY ARE UNABLE TO REACH A SETTLEMENT.; MATTER IS SET FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 07/25/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S36P; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RENATO A DE LA ROSA, HERMAN A DE LA ROSA FOR FAX FILING, COPY, RETURN ENVELOPE/POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 180216-0214 $5.21; 180216-0214-VS Reference Number 031-0086715164

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST;FOR ORDER SUSPENDING AND REMOVING TRUSTEE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID NAPLES APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; ATTORNEY LOUIE RUIZ PRESENT FOR DANIEL DE LA ROSA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT MAKES THE TEMPORARY ORDER: THAT NEITHER RENATO DANIEL DE LA ROSA NOR ROSEMARY DE LA ROSA; BRIZO SHALL BE PERMITTED TO DISPOSE OF MORTGAGE, PLEDGE, ENCUMBER, HYPOTHECATE, OR OTHERWISE; TRANSFER THE TRUST REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 935 N KINGSLEY DR OR 5324 S HOOVER ST.; COUNSEL TO SUBMIT ORDER.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON GRANTING THE MOTION TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING ETC RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RENATO A DE LA ROSA FOR MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING; Minutes; Receipt: 170224-0163 $90.00; 170224-0163-CK Reference Number 1041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: FOR AN OREDER TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING ETC SET FOR HEARING ON 05/01/17, FILED BY PETITIONER RENATO A DE LA ROSA (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/02/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED TRUST;FOR ORDER SUSPENDING AND REMOVING TRUSTEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RENATO A DE LA ROSA, HERMAN A DE LA ROSA FOR TRUST PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0240 $465.00; 161214-0240-CK Reference Number 111410

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.