This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:06:23 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF JAMES -V- CITY OF FONTANA

Case Summary

On 12/08/2016 THE ESTATE OF JAMES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF FONTANA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1023

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID HALL

THE ESTATE OF JAMES HALL

KAREN HALL

MERRY JAMES

JULIE KARBGINSKY

Defendants

SERGEANT DAVID LALLY

OFFICER ROBERT GLACE

FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT

OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ

OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA

OFFICER CHRISTOPHER DRAYER

OFFICER STEVEN ROE

OFFICER SHANE MCCOY

OFFICER SHAWN CORY

OFFICER NEIL BACHMAN

CITY OF FONTANA

OFFICER RYAN WINDELL

OFFICER CASEY MUTTER

OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERAGOS & GERAGOS,APC

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

LAWRENCE BEACH ALLEN & CHOI, PC

2677 North Main Street Suite 370

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

DEMURRER FILED BY OFFICER RYAN WINDELL, OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ, OFFICER CHRISTOPHERDRAYER, OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA, OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT, OFFICER CASEY MUTTER, OFFICER STEVEN ROE; REPRESENTED BY LAWRENCE BEACH ALLEN & CHOI, PC(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY OFFICER RYAN WINDELL, OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ, OFFICER CHRISTOPHERDRAYER, OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA, OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT, OFFICER CASEY MUTTER, OFFICER STEVEN ROE; REPRESENTED BY LAWRENCE BEACH ALLEN & CHOI, PC(IMAGED); Minutes; "DEM" CODE ENTERED TWICE IN ORDER TO BE ABLE TO ATTACH ALL 14 DEFENDANTS DEMURRING. SYSTEM ONLY; ALLOWS 10 PARTIES TO BE ATTACHED AT A TIME. **ONE DEMURRER SUBMITTED FOR ALL 14 DEFENDANTS**

DEMURRER FILED BY OFFICER RYAN WINDELL, OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ, OFFICER CHRISTOPHERDRAYER, OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA, OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT, OFFICER CASEY MUTTER, OFFICER STEVEN ROE; REPRESENTED BY LAWRENCE BEACH ALLEN & CHOI, PC(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY OFFICER RYAN WINDELL, OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ, OFFICER CHRISTOPHERDRAYER, OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA, OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT, OFFICER CASEY MUTTER, OFFICER STEVEN ROE; REPRESENTED BY LAWRENCE BEACH ALLEN & CHOI, PC(IMAGED); Minutes; "DEM" CODE ENTERED TWICE IN ORDER TO BE ABLE TO ATTACH ALL 14 DEFENDANTS DEMURRING. SYSTEM ONLY; ALLOWS 10 PARTIES TO BE ATTACHED AT A TIME. **ONE DEMURRER SUBMITTED FOR ALL 14 DEFENDANTS**

DEMURRER FILED BY OFFICER RYAN WINDELL, OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ, OFFICER CHRISTOPHERDRAYER, OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA, OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT, OFFICER CASEY MUTTER, OFFICER STEVEN ROE; REPRESENTED BY LAWRENCE BEACH ALLEN & CHOI, PC(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY OFFICER RYAN WINDELL, OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ, OFFICER CHRISTOPHERDRAYER, OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA, OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT, OFFICER CASEY MUTTER, OFFICER STEVEN ROE; REPRESENTED BY LAWRENCE BEACH ALLEN & CHOI, PC(IMAGED); Minutes; "DEM" CODE ENTERED TWICE IN ORDER TO BE ABLE TO ATTACH ALL 14 DEFENDANTS DEMURRING. SYSTEM ONLY; ALLOWS 10 PARTIES TO BE ATTACHED AT A TIME. **ONE DEMURRER SUBMITTED FOR ALL 14 DEFENDANTS**

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL, MERRY JAMES, DAVID HALL, KAREN HALL, JULIE KARBGINSKY.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL, MERRY JAMES, DAVID HALL, KAREN HALL, JULIE KARBGINSKY.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER CASEY MUTTER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER CASEY MUTTER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER ANDREW HACKETT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER CHRISTOPHERDRAYER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER CHRISTOPHERDRAYER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER DOMENICO ANCONA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER GIOVANNI HERNANDEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER SHAWN CORY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER SHAWN CORY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER RYAN WINDELL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER RYAN WINDELL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SERGEANT DAVID LALLY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SERGEANT DAVID LALLY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER ROBERT GLACE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OFFICER ROBERT GLACE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF FONTANA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF FONTANA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170803-0508 $3.00; 170803-0508-MC Reference Number 033-0028268756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0028268756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL, MERRY JAMES, DAVID HALL, KAREN HALL, JULIE KARBGINSKY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT (02/21/17) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF FONTANA, FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT, OFFICER NEIL BACHMAN, OFFICER ROBERT GLACE, SERGEANT DAVID LALLY, OFFICER SHANE MCCOY, OFFICER SHAWN CORY, OFFICER RYAN WINDELL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DECLARATION OF MERRY JAMES PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FONTANA POLICE DEPARTMENT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • PLAINTIFF THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL, MERRY JAMES, DAVID HALL, KAREN HALL, JULIE KARBGINSKY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL, MERRY JAMES, DAVID HALL, KAREN HALL FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161212-0175 $20.00; 161212-0175-VS Reference Number 026-0001383307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE ESTATE OF JAMESHALL, MERRY JAMES, DAVID HALL, KAREN HALL FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161212-0169 $435.00; 161212-0169-VS Reference Number 026-0001383307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less