This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:11:32 (UTC).

THE BROWN FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 THE BROWN FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0889

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAUREL MCLINDEN

Other

THE BROWN FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JOHN G WURM

Po Box 1875

Lake Arrowhead, CA 92352

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/10/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/10/18 FILED.

AMENDED (SECOND) PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST, SETTLE MENT OF ACCOUNT AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED.

AMENDED (SECOND) PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST, SETTLE MENT OF ACCOUNT AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED.

HRG OF 03/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

EXHIBITS TO AMENDED PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

EXHIBITS TO AMENDED PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

CONSENT TO TERMINATION OF TRUST BY JESSE CROSS FILED.

CONSENT TO TERMINATION OF TRUST BY JESSE CROSS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/20/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/20/18 FILED.

PETITION RE: (AMENDED) TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

PETITION RE: (AMENDED) TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

AGREEMENT FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE BY LAUREL MCLINDEN AND KARA CROSS FILED.

AGREEMENT FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE BY LAUREL MCLINDEN AND KARA CROSS FILED.

HRG OF 01/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

FILING OF CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

FILING OF CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

HRG OF 01/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/03/18 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/03/18 W/POS FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST PROBATE CODE 17200(B)(13) FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST PROBATE CODE 17200(B)(13) FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • ORDER ON PET. FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST AND SETTLEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LAUREL MCLINDEN FOR 1-CC OF ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180710-0209 $26.50; 180710-0209-DB Reference Number 031-0129457627

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • PETITION FOR FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST PROBATE CODE 17200(B)(13); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; LAUREL MCLINDEN PRESENT.; ATTORNEY JOHN WURM PRESENT FOR LAUREL MCLINDEN.; ATTORNEY JONATHON COLE (VIA COURTCALL) PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT FINDS UNDER PRC17200 THE TRUST IS INVALID. THE CORUT FRTHER FINDS PETITIONER HAS; CONDUCTED DUE DILIGENCE IN LOCATING THE FAMILY TRUST.; PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF THE BROWN FAMILY TRUST DATED 2/23/93 IS GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COUNSEL REPORTS PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION FOLLOWS THE AGREED UPON PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 09/18/2017 OF LAUREL MCLINDEN ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • HRG OF 07/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • HRG OF 07/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/10/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED (SECOND) PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST, SETTLE MENT OF ACCOUNT AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • PETITION FOR FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST PROBATE CODE 17200(B)(13); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN WURM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JONATHAN COLE FOR KARA CROSS APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; THE STATE CONTROLLER REQUESTS AN ORDER APPROVING ACCOUTING PRIOR TO DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MR. WURM.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREEMENT FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATE BY LAUREL MCLINDEN AND KARA CROSS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING OF CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/03/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/03/18 W/POS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PETITION FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: FOR TERMINATION OF TRUST PROBATE CODE 17200(B)(13) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LAUREL MCLINDEN FOR PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0184 $465.00; 170918-0184-CK Reference Number 28405

    Read MoreRead Less