This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 21:35:34 (UTC).

THE BREAK ROOM GROUP-V-JOHN MCMAHON ETAL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 THE BREAK ROOM GROUP-V-JOHN MCMAHON ETAL was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8921

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE BREAK ROOM GROUP

Respondents

JOHN MCMAHON, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SHERIFF

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO SHERIFF'S DEPARTME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES DEAGUILERA

2068 Orange Tree Lane Suite 218

Redlands, CA 92374

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS HEARING TO 4/12/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS HEARING TO 4/12/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO SHERIFF'S DEPARTME; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $27.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO SHERIFF'S DEPARTME; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $27.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOHN MCMAHON, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SHERIFF; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOHN MCMAHON, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SHERIFF; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS(PETITIONER COUNSEL FTA); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS HEARING TO 4/12/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MILES KOWALSKI PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; LAW OFFICES OF JAMES DEAGUILERA FOR THE BREAK ROOM GROUP NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS HEARING ON PETITION.; COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT REPRESENTS THAT PETITION HAS BEEN SERVED/RECEIVED AND IS MAKING A GENERAL; APPEARANCE AT THIS TIME. COUNSEL FURTHER REPRESENTS THAT THIS PETITION ARISES FROM A; SEARCH WARRANT ON A BUSINESS AND IS UNSURE THE EXTENT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, OR EVEN IF; THERE IS ONE AT THIS TIME.; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE MADE BY COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER, COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR:; OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR; ATTORNEY JAMES DEAGUILERA IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $250.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; IF RESPONDENTS COUNSEL HAS INCURRED ANY ADDITIONAL EXPENSES AS A RESULT OF COUNSELS; NON-APPEARANCE , A DECLARATION MAY BE SUBMITTED AND THE COURT WILL CONSIDER IT AND IMPOSE; ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS.; HEARING RE: STATUS ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS CONTINUED TO COINCIDE WITH OSC.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(PETITIONER COUNSEL FTA) SET FOR 04/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO SHERIFF'S DEPARTME; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $27.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOHN MCMAHON, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SHERIFF; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE BREAK ROOM GROUP FOR FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0174 $3.00; 170314-0174-MC Reference Number 033-0012839171

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT V GARCIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY SUE KLUMP FOR LAW OFFICES OF JAMES DEAGUILERA FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: TO EFFECT SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE IS AN UNLIMITED CASE, NOT A LIMITED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161108-0227 $12.00; 161108-0227-MC Reference Number 025-0060257167

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161108-0226 $4.50; 161108-0226-MC Reference Number 025-0060257167

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE BREAK ROOM GROUP FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161108-0219 $435.00; 161108-0219-MC Reference Number 025-0060257167

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.