This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:58:31 (UTC).

THE BRAYDEN HANSON SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 THE BRAYDEN HANSON SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1092

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LAURI HANSON

HERB THOMAS

Other

THE BRAYDEN HANSONSPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Not Classified By Court

BRAYDEN HANSON

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

URBATSCH, KEVIN

3478 Buskirk Ave Ste 300

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

LAYNE A BARTHOLOMEW

222 N Mountain Ave Ste 100

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 05/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER SETTLING FIRST ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF TRUSTEE FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FIRST ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF TRUSTEE FILED.

HRG OF 08/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON AUGUST 28, 2018 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON AUGUST 28, 2018 FILED.

FIRST ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY HERB THOMAS

FIRST ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY HERB THOMAS

HRG OF 09/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING TRUSTEE HERB THOMAS TO PURCHASE RESIDENCE ON SHORTENED FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING TRUSTEE HERB THOMAS TO PURCHASE RESIDENCE ON SHORTENED FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/27/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/27/17 FILED.

ORDER GRANTING SHORTENED TIME FOR HEARING ON PETITION AUTHORIZING PURCHASE OF HOME ETC FILED

ORDER GRANTING SHORTENED TIME FOR HEARING ON PETITION AUTHORIZING PURCHASE OF HOME ETC FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION TO ESTABLISH SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION TO ESTABLISH SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 05/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

REPORT (INITIAL) AND RECOMMENDATION OF COURT APPOINT GAL FILED

REPORT (INITIAL) AND RECOMMENDATION OF COURT APPOINT GAL FILED

DECLARATION OF LAURI HANSON IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ETC FILED

DECLARATION OF LAURI HANSON IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ETC FILED

HRG OF 01/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/19/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/19/17 FILED.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/01/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF TRUSTEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF HERB THOMAS AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LANE BARTHOLOMEW PRESENT FOR HERB THOMAS.; ATTORNEY MITCHELL ROTH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BRAYDEN HANSON.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY COUNSEL.; COURT CLEARS PROBATE NOTE NO. 1; COURT APPROVES PETITIONER REQUEST FOR COMPENSATION OF $4,874.00.; COURT APPROVES ATTORNEY REQUEST FOR FEES OF $1,864.00.; FIRST ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COURT SETS MATTER FOR HEARING ON THE 2ND ACCOUNTING AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 10/01/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST ACCOUNT CURRENT AND REPORT OF HERB THOMAS AS TRUSTEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/02/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2017
  • ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 11/01/2016 OF LAURI HANSON FOR BRAYDEN HANSON ADD MITCHELL ROTH AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO ESTALBISH SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST PERMISSION TO INVEST IN MUTUAL FUNDS ETC; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; KEVIN URBATSCH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR LAURI HANSON.; LAURI HANSON PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT CONTINUES MATTER FOR COUNSEL TO ADDRESS THE CONCERNS OF THE COURT RECITED INTO THE RECORD.; COURT APPOINTS MITCHELL ROTH AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRAYDEN HANSON. CLERKS OFFICE TO PROVIDE A; COPY OF THE FILE TO MITCHELL ROTH.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/30/17 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/19/17 W/POS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/19/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON ESTABLISHING SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO ESTALBISH SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST PERMISSION TO INVEST IN MUTUAL FUNDS ETC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161101-0233 $230.00; 161101-0233-CK Reference Number 104952

    Read MoreRead Less