This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:41:31 (UTC).

THE BEST SERVICE-V-LEAL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 THE BEST SERVICE-V-LEAL was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2192

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC

Defendant

JOHN LEAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAREN, CLARK

6700 S. Centinela Avenue Third Floor

Culver City, CA 90230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170816-0837 $25.00; 170816-0837-CK Reference Number 17714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC ORDERED ENTERED 07/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN LEAL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,953.92 INTEREST $651.04 ATTORNEY FEES $545.39 COSTS $390.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,540.35; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JOHN LEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC AS TO JOHN LEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOHN LEAL WITH COSTS OF $72.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE BEST SERVICE CO, INC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0314 $240.00; 170207-0314-CK Reference Number 16585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,953.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 10.0 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 11/25/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.