This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 02:31:57 (UTC).

THE BERRY J SLATER LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 11/09/2016 THE BERRY J SLATER LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1133

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Trustees

VIRGINIA MCDOLE

YAAJA LACHAUN BREWER-DRAPER

BRANDY M HUNT

Other

THE BERRY J SLATERLIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

GRAVES, SUZANNE M

1317 W Foothill Blvd Suite 245

Upland, CA 91786-3693

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 06/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVERSHEET 05/09/17 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

MAILING COVERSHEET 05/09/17 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 2ND SPPLMT TO PET BY MAIL ON 05/05/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 2ND SPPLMT TO PET BY MAIL ON 05/05/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

MAILING COVERSHEET IMPORTANT CORRESPONDENCE 04/26/17 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

MAILING COVERSHEET IMPORTANT CORRESPONDENCE 04/26/17 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

HRG OF 04/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 05/05/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 05/05/17 FILED.

HRG OF 03/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DECLARATION OF VIRGINIA MCDOLE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FILED

DECLARATION OF VIRGINIA MCDOLE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/2017 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/2017 FILED.

DECLARATION OF PATRICK YARBER FILED

DECLARATION OF PATRICK YARBER FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/2017 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/2017 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PTN TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION OF TRUS BY MAIL ON 02/10/17 AS TO CHRISTOPHER JAMEL SLATER, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PTN TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION OF TRUS BY MAIL ON 02/10/17 AS TO CHRISTOPHER JAMEL SLATER, FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION BY MAIL ON 01/25/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION BY MAIL ON 01/25/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/24/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/24/17 FILED.

PETITION TO TRANSFER PROPERTY INTO LIVING TRUST AND ETC FILED BY VIRGINIA MCDOLE(PROBATE).

PETITION TO TRANSFER PROPERTY INTO LIVING TRUST AND ETC FILED BY VIRGINIA MCDOLE(PROBATE).

PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRUST INSTRUMENT, TO DETERMINE THE ETC FILED.

PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRUST INSTRUMENT, TO DETERMINE THE ETC FILED.

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY VIRGINIA MCDOLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • PETITION FOR RECEIVE LEONDRA DARLENE DRAPER PORTION OF THE BERR Y J. SLATER LIVING TRUST DATED 08/01/2001; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF PETITION FILED BY BRANDY M HUNT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE PETITION TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRUST INSTRUMENT, ETC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRUST INSTRUMENT, TO DETERMINE THE ETC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY COURTNEY MEDINA PRESENT FOR VIRGINIA MCDOLE, PRESENT.; BRANDY HUNT PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE (GUARDIAN AD LITEM) PRESENT FOR KERRINGTON HALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT GRANTS THE PETITION- COUNSEL INDICATES THEY ARE REQUESTING TO WITHDRAW REQUEST MADE AS; TO NUMBER 11.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COURT RELIEVES WALTER MOORE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KERRINGTON HALL.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); NO FUTURE HEARING DATES AS TRUST IS NOT COURT SUPERVISED TRUST.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO TRANSFER PROPERTY INTO LIVING TRUST AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ETC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY COURTNEY MEDINA PRESENT FOR VIRGINIA MCDOLE, PRESENT.; ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE (GUARDIAN AD LITEM) PRESENT FOR KERRINGTON HALL.; BRANDY HUNT PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COUNSEL INDICATES THIS PETITION WAS WITHDRAWN ON JUNE 2, 2017.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO ADD MICHAEL ROBERTS II AS A BENEFICIARY FOR COLLEGE TRUST; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY COURTNEY MEDINA PRESENT FOR VIRGINIA MCDOLE, PRESENT.; BRANDY HUNT PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE (GUARDIAN AD LITEM) PRESENT FOR KERRINGTON HALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION IS DENIED.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR RECEIVE LEONDRA DARLENE DRAPER PORTIO; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY COURTNEY MEDINA PRESENT FOR VIRGINIA MCDOLE, PRESENT.; BRANDY HUNT PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE (GUARDIAN AD LITEM) PRESENT FOR KERRINGTON HALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION IS DENIED- NO LEGAL BASIS; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL OF PETITION TO ADD MICHAEL, ETC; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY COURTNEY MEDINA PRESENT FOR VIRGINIA MCDOLE, PRESENT.; BRANDY HUNT PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ATTORNEY WALTER MOORE (GUARDIAN AD LITEM) PRESENT FOR KERRINGTON HALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: MOOT- PETITION IS DENIED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO CHRISTIAN ALEXANDER JOHNSON BY MAIL ON 6/7/17 OF ATTACHED LIST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VIRGINIA MCDOLE FOR PETITION TO TRANSFER PROPERTY ETC; Minutes; Receipt: 161115-0230 $465.00; 161115-0230-CK Reference Number 142

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON TRANSFERRING PROPERTY INTO LIVING TRUST RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO TRANSFER PROPERTY INTO LIVING TRUST AND ETC FILED BY VIRGINIA MCDOLE(PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF PERMANENT ADDRESS OF BENEFICIARY YAAJA LA CHAUN DRAPER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BARBARA FORTSON REGARDING THE PETITION TO ETC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF VIRGINIA MCDOLE IN SUPPORT OF HER PETITION TO ETC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO DETERMINE QUESTIONS OF CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRUST INSTRUMENT, TO DETERMINE THE ETC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161115-0173 $465.00; 161115-0173-CK Reference Number 143

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.