This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:19:39 (UTC).

THE BARKSDALE HERITAGE TRUST -V- HERNANDEZ et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2017 THE BARKSDALE HERITAGE TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0050

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BARKSDALE HERITAGE

Defendants

JOSEPH SOTO

MYRA HERNANDEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY MYRA HERNANDEZ, JOSEPH SOTO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY MYRA HERNANDEZ, JOSEPH SOTO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSEPH SOTO; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/17/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSEPH SOTO; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/17/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MYRA HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/17/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MYRA HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/17/17

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170216-0737 $255.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER ROWENA MASIH 7426; BAILIFF: S LEACH; ATTORNEY HARLAN BRANSKY (LIMITED APPEARANCE) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RONALD BLANKENSHIP, TRUSTEE, PRESENT; DEFENDANT MYRA HERNANDEZ, JOSEPH SOTO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: THE BARKSDALE HERITAGE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; (SIGNED BY COUNSEL AND DEFENDANTS); WITNESS -- MYRA HERNANDEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- JOSEPH SOTO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: THE BARKSDALE HERITAGE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MYRA HERNANDEZ, JOSEPH SOTO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 04/13/17.; IF DEFENDANTS LEAVE THE PREMISES IN GOOD CONDITION, PLAINTIFF WILL PAY DEFENDANTS $500; UPON MOVE OUT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/16/2017 OF THE BARKSDALE HERITAGE AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170223-0828 $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MYRA HERNANDEZ, JOSEPH SOTO FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $480.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY MYRA HERNANDEZ, JOSEPH SOTO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSEPH SOTO; PARTY SERVED ON 02/17/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/16/2017 OF THE BARKSDALE HERITAGE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MYRA HERNANDEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 02/17/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • ADA MEMO SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170216-0737 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less