This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:33:16 (UTC).

THE ANITA DI ANTONIO LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 THE ANITA DI ANTONIO LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1235

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVID DI ANTONIO

Other

THE ANITA DI ANTONIO LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRISCILLA C SOLARIO

9431 Haven Ave Suite 110

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE FILED.

CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/28/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/28/17 FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

CONSENT & WAIVER OF NOTICE FILED.

CONSENT & WAIVER OF NOTICE FILED.

HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITIO FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITIO FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/07/17 AS TO RALPH DI ANTONIO, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/07/17 AS TO RALPH DI ANTONIO, FILED.

ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY FILED

ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY FILED

HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: ORDR DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY & FOR ORDR DIRECTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED.

PETITION RE: ORDR DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY & FOR ORDR DIRECTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED.

HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE FILED.

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170725-0185 $26.00; 170725-0185-VS Reference Number 01796G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • PETITION FOR ORDR DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY & FOR ORDR DIRECTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PRISCILLA SOLARIO PRESENT FOR DAVID DI ANTONIO.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 12/14/2016 OF DAVID DI ANTONIO IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 12/14/2016 OF DAVID DI ANTONIO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/25/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSENT & WAIVER OF NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITIO FOR ORDER DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/07/17 AS TO RALPH DI ANTONIO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • PETITION FOR ORDR DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY & FOR ORDR DIRECTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PRISCILLA SOLARIO APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MATTER IS CONTINUED TO GIVE PROPER NOTICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/25/17 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/28/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID DI ANTONIO FOR TRUST; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0892 $465.00; 161214-0892-VS Reference Number 031-0003480055

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ** VOID ** PROBATE >1.5M <2M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: ORDR DETERMINING TRUSTS TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY & FOR ORDR DIRECTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0106 $465.00; 161214-0106-CK Reference Number 031-0003480055

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.