This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/11/2018 at 21:09:51 (UTC).

TESSCO-V-THE WIRELESS SHOP

Case Summary

On 04/04/2011 TESSCO-V-THE WIRELESS SHOP was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0254

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TESSCO INCORPORATED

Defendants

THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC

RASHAD DOILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLINS LAW

2601 Main Street Penthouse Ste 1300

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 120111-2633 $25.00; 120111-2633-CK Reference Number 5773

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED ORDERED ENTERED 09/26/11; JUDGMENT FOR: TESSCO INCORPORATED; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC, RASHAD DOILEY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,703.48 INTEREST $2,777.04 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $338.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12,818.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED ORDERED ENTERED 09/26/11; JUDGMENT FOR: TESSCO INCORPORATED; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC, RASHAD DOILEY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,703.48 INTEREST $2,777.04 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $338.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12,818.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED AS TO DOES ONLY

DECLARATION OF RUDY GABA FILED

DECLARATION OF RUDY GABA FILED

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC, RASHAD DOILEY.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC, RASHAD DOILEY.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT RE: INTEREST IN PRAYER - NEEDS CORRECTION (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT RE: INTEREST IN PRAYER - NEEDS CORRECTION (IMAGED)

CLERK'S OFFICE RETURNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACAKGE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: PRAYER IS NOT CLEAR/ INTEREST NEEDS CORRECTION.

CLERK'S OFFICE RETURNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACAKGE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: PRAYER IS NOT CLEAR/ INTEREST NEEDS CORRECTION.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC, RASHAD DOILEY FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC, RASHAD DOILEY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/26/11

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/26/11

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/26/11

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/26/11

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RASHAD DOILEY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/27/11

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RASHAD DOILEY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/27/11

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED

CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110405-3620 $240.00; 110405-3620-CK Reference Number 201903

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 120111-2633 $25.00; 120111-2633-CK Reference Number 5773

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED ORDERED ENTERED 09/26/11; JUDGMENT FOR: TESSCO INCORPORATED; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC, RASHAD DOILEY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,703.48 INTEREST $2,777.04 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $338.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12,818.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2011 OF TESSCO INCORPORATED AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RUDY GABA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC, RASHAD DOILEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT RE: INTEREST IN PRAYER - NEEDS CORRECTION (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE WIRELESS SHOP LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/26/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RASHAD DOILEY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/27/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • ADA MEMO ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110405-3620 $240.00; 110405-3620-CK Reference Number 201903

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.