This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2018 at 06:10:00 (UTC).

TERRY FLEMING-V-JEAN PELOQUIN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/16/2013 TERRY FLEMING-V-JEAN PELOQUIN, was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0018

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

TERRY L FLEMING SR

Defendants and Respondents

JEAN VICTOR PELOQUIN

LINDA PELOQUIN

CAPITAL SOURCE PARTNERS

J. VICTOR CONSTRUCTION, INC.

HAVASU LAKESHORE INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PAUL D. BOJIC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

TEEPLE HALL, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/20/2017

DocketORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/NO PROOF OF SERVICE; ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2017

DocketORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/NO PROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2017

DocketORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/NO PROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2017

DocketORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER CHELSEA DEVORE 13842; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/NO PROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2017

DocketVOL 6 ROUTED TO S30 FOR 5/31 HRG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2017

DocketFEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170510-0480 $3.00; 170510-0480-CK Reference Number CK 096060

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2017

DocketAPPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2017

DocketAPPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2017

DocketAPPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2017

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FREDERICK M REICH RE EXAMINATION OF KATHERINE DOUCETTE FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
268 More Docket Entries
05/01/2013

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON J. VICTOR CONSTRUCTION, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/24/13 (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2013

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JEAN VICTOR PELOQUIN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/24/13 (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2013

DocketCASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S36 FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013

DocketUPDATE JURISDICTION TO DS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013

DocketFEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 130417-0962 $17.00; 130417-0962-VS Reference Number 025-0051021560

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013

DocketNOTICE IMAGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013

DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 130417-0946 $435.00; 130417-0946-VS Reference Number 025-0051021560

[+] Read More [-] Read Less