This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:22:52 (UTC).

TERESITA ANGELES BOWERS

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 TERESITA ANGELES BOWERS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1060

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES BOWERS

MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN

Decedent

TERESITA ANGELES BOWERS

Not Classified By Court

MARIA RHEA ANGELES FRANCISCO

SHERYLL A. BAUTISTA

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SIMONIAN LAW, APC

131 N El Molino Avenue Suite 300

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 02/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/21/19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/21/19 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 30,000, JAMES SMOTHERS APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 30,000, JAMES SMOTHERS APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/30/19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/30/19 - PROBATE NOTES

VERIFICATION OF SHERRYL A BAUTISTA IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS FILED.

VERIFICATION OF SHERRYL A BAUTISTA IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS FILED.

HRG OF 08/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/PET FOR SUCC TRUSTEE, ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/02/18 AS TO MANILLE FRANCISCO, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/PET FOR SUCC TRUSTEE, ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/02/18 AS TO MANILLE FRANCISCO, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/PET FOR SUCC TRUSTEE, ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/02/18 AS TO ROMEO RAPHAEL FRANCISCO, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/PET FOR SUCC TRUSTEE, ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/02/18 AS TO ROMEO RAPHAEL FRANCISCO, FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/22/18, FILED BY PETITIONER SHERYLL A. BAUTISTA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/22/18, FILED BY PETITIONER SHERYLL A. BAUTISTA (IMAGED)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR CONFIRMING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED BY MARIA RHEA ANGLES FRANCISCO

OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR CONFIRMING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED BY MARIA RHEA ANGLES FRANCISCO

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/24/2017 OF MARIA ANGELES GUZMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/24/2017 OF MARIA ANGELES GUZMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/24/2017 OF MARIA ANGELES GUZMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/24/2017 OF MARIA ANGELES GUZMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/24/2017 OF MARIA ANGELES GUZMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/24/2017 OF MARIA ANGELES GUZMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NTC TO ROMEO FRANCISCO FILED BY MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NTC TO ROMEO FRANCISCO FILED BY MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • HEARING RE: STATUS/850 PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMANS ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/21/19 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMANS ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT C SAYRE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRIAN MILES PRESENT FOR MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN.; PETITIONER MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT INQUIRES OF THE PARTIES.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO FINALIZE AN AMENDED ACCOUNTING AND TO FILE THE 850 PETITION. COUNSEL INTENDS TO HAVE; THEM BOTH FILED WITHIN THE NEXT 30 DAYS.; THE COURT CONTINUES THESE MATTERS TO 08/21/19. THE COURT RESERVES THE DATE OF 08/21/19 FOR; THESE MATTERS TO BE HEARD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/21/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MR MILES.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • HEARING RE: STATUS/850 PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT C SAYRE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRIAN MILES PRESENT FOR MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN.; PETITIONER MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; COURT INQUIRES OF THE PARTIES.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO FINALIZE AN AMENDED ACCOUNTING AND TO FILE THE 850 PETITION. COUNSEL INTENDS TO HAVE; THEM BOTH FILED WITHIN THE NEXT 30 DAYS.; THE COURT CONTINUES THESE MATTERS TO 08/21/19. THE COURT RESERVES THE DATE OF 08/21/19 FOR; THESE MATTERS TO BE HEARD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/21/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MR MILES.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 06/05/19 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 06/05/19 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • ON THE PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/24/2017 OF MARIA ANGELES GUZMAN, WESTERN SURETY COMPANY IS ADDED AS A BOND COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMIN W/GENERAL POWERS FILED BY MARIA THRIXIE ANGLES GUZMAN(PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • PARTY MARIA THRIXIE ANGELES GUZMAN UPDATED: PETITIONERS LAST NAME - CLERICAL ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less