Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 10:37:01 (UTC).

TERESA OLIVERA -V- MARIO HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 TERESA OLIVERA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIO HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1636

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TERESA OLIVERA

Respondent

MARIO HERNANDEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 12/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/31/2017 OF TERESA OLIVERA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/31/2017 OF TERESA OLIVERA ORDERED ENTERED 09/20/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 09/14/17 BY TERESA OLIVERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MARIO HERNANDEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 05/31/2017 OF TERESA OLIVERA AS TO MARIO HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TERESA OLIVERA FOR PRELIM/WVR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARIO HERNANDEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY TERESA OLIVERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY TERESA OLIVERA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON TERESA OLIVERA FOR FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less