This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:00:20 (UTC).

TED STIMPFEL-V-BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 TED STIMPFEL-V-BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1643

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TED STIMPFEL

Defendant

BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF DECISION * (IMAGED)

STATEMENT OF DECISION * (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0813 $30.00

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:16; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF TED STIMPFEL PRESENT; BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC REPRESENTED BY KATHERINE BAILEY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS TO PROCEED AS A DEFAULT; REQUEST TO PROCEED BY DEFAULT IS DENIED; WITNESS -- TED STIMPFEL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- KATHERINE BAILEY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER IS TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; COURT FINDS:; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; STATEMENT OF DECISION SIGNED AND FILED.; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TED STIMPFEL ORDERED ENTERED 12/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC; AND AGAINST TED STIMPFEL; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 12/4/17 MINUTES AND STATEMENT OF DECISION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC; PARTY SERVED ON 10/05/17 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC; PARTY SERVED ON 10/05/17 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 12/06/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DECISION * (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:16; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF TED STIMPFEL PRESENT; BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC REPRESENTED BY KATHERINE BAILEY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS TO PROCEED AS A DEFAULT; REQUEST TO PROCEED BY DEFAULT IS DENIED; WITNESS -- TED STIMPFEL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- KATHERINE BAILEY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER IS TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; COURT FINDS:; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; STATEMENT OF DECISION SIGNED AND FILED.; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF TED STIMPFEL ORDERED ENTERED 12/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC; AND AGAINST TED STIMPFEL; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 12/4/17 MINUTES AND STATEMENT OF DECISION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC; PARTY SERVED ON 10/05/17 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PARTY BARSTOW RETAIL PARTNERS, LLC UPDATED: CITY FOR DEF INCORRECT UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0814 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0813 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less