This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:34:43 (UTC).

T.D. SERVICE COMPANY-V-CASTANEDA

Case Summary

On 12/15/2016 T D SERVICE COMPANY-V-CASTANEDA was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1180

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T.D. SERVICE COMPANY

Defendants

CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION

RONNY CASTANEDA

FITZGERALD INDUSTRIAL PARK, LP

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CENTRAL COLLECTION

BURRTEC WASTE INDUSTRIES, INC

NELLIE HUERTA

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE DREYFUSS FIRM

2 Ventura Suite 450

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorneys

BROWN, JR, RONALD K.

901 Dove Street, Suite 120

Newport Beach, CA 92660

JEAN RENE BASLE

385 N Arrowhead Ave 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIF

300 South Spring St, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1204

 

Court Documents

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEF#1:EXCLUDE EVIDENCE/WIT NOT PREVIOUSLY PRODUCED FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEF#1:EXCLUDE EVIDENCE/WIT NOT PREVIOUSLY PRODUCED FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS ISO MSJ AGAINST RONNIE CASTANEDA FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS ISO MSJ AGAINST RONNIE CASTANEDA FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEF#2:EXCLUDE EVIDENCE/WIT NOT PRODUCED BY HUERTA FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DEF#2:EXCLUDE EVIDENCE/WIT NOT PRODUCED BY HUERTA FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MSJ AGAINST NELLIE HUERTA FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MSJ AGAINST NELLIE HUERTA FILED.

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT TO MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ALT SUMMARY ADJUDICATION SET FOR HEARING ON 11/16/17 FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT TO MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ALT SUMMARY ADJUDICATION SET FOR HEARING ON 11/16/17 FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN. (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ANS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO FITZGERALD INDUSTRIAL PARK, LP. PARTY SERVED ON 12/21/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ANS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO FITZGERALD INDUSTRIAL PARK, LP. PARTY SERVED ON 12/21/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

DECLARATION OF MITCHELL L NORTON FILED

DECLARATION OF MITCHELL L NORTON FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL SVC ON 05/04/17 AS TO THE DRYEFUSS FIRM, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL SVC ON 05/04/17 AS TO THE DRYEFUSS FIRM, FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLA MOTION FOR DISCHARGE FILED BY T.D. SERVICE COMPANY.

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLA MOTION FOR DISCHARGE FILED BY T.D. SERVICE COMPANY.

ANSWER FILED BY RONNY CASTANEDA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY RONNY CASTANEDA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT NELLIE HUERTA.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO NELLIE HUERTA

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY GENERAL OFTHE STATE OF CALIF.

ANSWER FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY GENERAL OFTHE STATE OF CALIF.

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN.

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(SETTLED); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; THE DREYFUSS FIRM FOR T.D. SERVICE COMPANY NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY VAN V NGUYEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 08:31; ON DEFENDANTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: ALL FUNDS HAVE BEEN RECEIVED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR DEFENSE TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(SETTLED); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA MORALES; COURT REPORTER ALICIA LINDSEY 13895; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: T.D. SERVICE COMPANY; ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMINISTRATION SCHEDULED TO APPEAR; BY COURTCALL. DUE TO THE COURTS TELEPHONE DIFFICULTIES, CHECK-INS WERE UNAVAILABLE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, THE HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED) CONTINUED TO 8/27/18 AT; 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT S22.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY FITZGERALD INDUSTRIAL PARK, LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(SETTLED); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; THE DREYFUSS FIRM FOR T.D. SERVICE COMPANY NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY RONALD BROWN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR FITZGERALD INDUSTRIAL PARK, LP.; ATTORNEY RONALD ITO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT IS ADVISED JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED. COUNSEL IS AWAITING DISPURSEMENT OF FUNDS AND; RECEIPT OF THE SETTLEMENT CHECK.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; COUNSEL FOR FITZGERALD INDUSTRIAL PARK TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RONALD K BROWN JR RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FILED BY FITZGERALD INDUSTRIAL PARK, LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(SETTLED); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; VAN V. NGUYEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMIN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT.; REASON: AWAITING THE COURT TO DISBURSE MONIES.; RELEASE OF FUNDS WAS SENT TO FINANCIAL SERVICES ON 04/12/18.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/21/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; COUNSEL FOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • RELEASE OF FUNDS SENT TO COURT FINANCIAL SERVICES.

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ANS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO FITZGERALD INDUSTRIAL PARK, LP. PARTY SERVED ON 12/21/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DEPOSITED $52,721.76 W/COUNTY FUND VPC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY T.D. SERVICE COMPANY FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0180 $435.00; 161215-0180-CK Reference Number 437564

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NO CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SO COURT MAY ESTABLISH JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.