This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 10:42:25 (UTC).

TD BANK -V- WOODS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 TD BANK -V- WOODS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3452

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

JASON G WOODS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

2650 Camino Del Rio North Ste 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • ORDER RE:LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS; AND GRANTING USE OF COPIES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 01/10/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TD BANK USA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JASON G WOODS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,661.03 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $319.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,980.03; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPP OF DEFAULT JUDGMN T RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT & STATEMENTS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A., FOR $319.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JASON G WOODS SERVED ON 08/06/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TD BANK USA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0386 $240.00; 170714-0386-CK Reference Number 701255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less