This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:52:16 (UTC).

TD BANK -V- UNG

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 TD BANK -V- UNG was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9634

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

BANITA L UNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C

4545 Murphy Canyon Road 3Rd Fl

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BANITA L UNG SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BANITA L UNG SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BANITA L UNG SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TD BANK USA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,424.82

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0415 $240.00; 171006-0415-CK Reference Number CK 702901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less