This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:53:07 (UTC).

TD BANK -V- MILLER

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 TD BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILLER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1288

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

JOANN L MILLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATION, LLP

2650 Camino Del Rio North, Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOANN L MILLER FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOANN L MILLER FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPP OF DEFAULT JUDGME NT RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPP OF DEFAULT JUDGME NT RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY & ASSOCIATION OF CO FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY & ASSOCIATION OF CO FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

ORDER LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS , GRANTING USE OF COPIES FILED

ORDER LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS , GRANTING USE OF COPIES FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DECLARATION BY MAIL ON 03/07/18 AS TO JOANN . MILLER, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DECLARATION BY MAIL ON 03/07/18 AS TO JOANN . MILLER, FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/03/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TD BANK USA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOANN L MILLER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,263.35 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $328.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,591.35; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOANN L MILLER; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:05; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; COUNSEL REPRESENTS HE IS CURRENTLY WAITING FOR AN AFFIDAVIT FROM THE CLIENT IN ORDER TO PROCESS; DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $50.00 PAYABLE TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 01/17/18.; (SANCTIONS IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT); HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/SANCTIONS SET FOR 03/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:07; ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOANN L MILLER SERVED ON 04/05/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOANN L MILLER SERVED ON 04/05/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT & STATEMENT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT & STATEMENT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A., FOR $407.00.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A., FOR $407.00.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180604-0378 $25.00; 180604-0378-CK Reference Number 602650

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/STATUS OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS , GRANTING USE OF COPIES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • HEARING RE: JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; RATHER THAN THE COURT REJECTING THE CCP 585 DECLARATION DUE TO EXCESSIVE AND UNSUPPORTED NOR; DOCUMENTED COSTS, AND IN EFFORT TO EXPEDITE PLAINTIFF(S)S DEFAULT AND MINIMIZE ADDITIONAL; COSTS AND DELAYS TO PLAINTIFF(S) AND THE COURT STAFF, AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOR DETRIMENT TO; THE DEFENDANT(S), THE COURT HAS REDUCED THE COSTS TO $328.00, THUS, THE OVERALL JUDGMENT HAS; BEEN PROPORTIONALLY REDUCED BY $ 79.00, FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $ 2,591.35; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/3/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/03/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TD BANK USA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOANN L MILLER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,263.35 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $328.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,591.35; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A., FOR $407.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT & STATEMENT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPP OF DEFAULT JUDGME NT RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF TD BANK USA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,263.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 12/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161216-0688 $240.00; 161216-0688-CK Reference Number CK 541364

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.