This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 07:40:57 (UTC).

TD BANK-V-MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 TD BANK-V-MARTINEZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2873

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

JOSE J MARTINEZ SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

2650 Camino Del Rio North Ste 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOSE J MARTINEZ SR WITH COSTS OF $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TD BANK USA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,687.47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0064 $240.00; 170712-0064-CK Reference Number 701402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less