This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 07:41:03 (UTC).

TD BANK-V-HUYNH

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 TD BANK-V-HUYNH was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2874

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

GINA HUYNH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

2650 Camino Del Rio North Ste 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 01/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TD BANK USA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GINA HUYNH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,457.77 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $319.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,776.77; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER [CCP 585(D)] FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 (D) FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: WAIVE INTEREST [CCP 585(D)] FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GINA HUYNH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. AS TO GINA HUYNH.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GINA HUYNH SERVED ON 08/02/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TD BANK USA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,457.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0036 $240.00; 170712-0036-CK Reference Number 701228

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less