This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:48:30 (UTC).

TD BANK -V- CALSIE J NAITO

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 TD BANK -V- CALSIE J NAITO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3192

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

CALSIE J NAITO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICES

2650 Camino Del Rio North Ste 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND ASSOCIATION FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CALSIE J NAITO WITH COSTS OF $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TD BANK USA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0018 $240.00; 170712-0018-CK Reference Number 701136

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,598.97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 06/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less