This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 07:51:07 (UTC).

TD BANK-V-ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 TD BANK-V-ALVAREZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2925

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

GUADALUPE ALVAREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICES

2650 Camino Del Rio North Ste 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180213-0516 $25.00; 180213-0516-CK Reference Number 602282

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: FOR JUDGMENT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 01/10/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TD BANK USA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GUADALUPE ALVAREZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,077.89 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $319.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,396.89; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT RE: WAIVE INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DEC IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GUADALUPE ALVAREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. AS TO GUADALUPE ALVAREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TD BANK USA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,077.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 07/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0421 $240.00; 170714-0421-CK Reference Number 701378

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less