This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 15:38:47 (UTC).

TD BANK USA VS AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 TD BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AGUILAR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1890

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

PATRICIA AGUILAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL,LLP

8665 Gibbs Dr., Ste, 150

San Diego, CA 92123

CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

2650 Camino Del Rio North Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 01/31/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL,LLP FOR TD BANK USA, N.A. CHANGES ITS NAME TO CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN R. FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:40; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY WAIVED; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 1 HOUR; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; BENCH TRIAL: ORDER: EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING; PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING: [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY; PAGE-NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C )(F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR; TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN; COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS,; EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESSES.; "TRIAL REQUIREMENTS" GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 01/31/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. IS SET FOR 11/30/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:41; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF PATRICIA AGUILAR IS DENIED.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PATRICIA AGUILAR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170202-0390 $240.00; 170202-0390-CK Reference Number 549579

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TD BANK USA, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.