This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 10:43:45 (UTC).

TD BANK USA -V- VALERIE OVERTON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 TD BANK USA -V- VALERIE OVERTON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3461

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

VALERIE OVERTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C.I.R. LLP

2650 Camino Del Rio North Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VALERIE OVERTON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. AS TO VALERIE OVERTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF TD BANK USA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/04/18; JUDGMENT FOR: TD BANK USA, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VALERIE OVERTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,097.67 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $338.95 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,436.62; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECL IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT RE WAIVE INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: ALLOWABLE RECOVERY OF MANDATORY E-FILING FEE FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:36; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT A SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN REACHED AND MORE TIME IS NEEDED TO; OBTAIN SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 WITH THE; COURT RESERVING JURISDICTION TO REINSTATE IF THERE IS A BREACH.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 03/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; 08:37; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TD BANK USA, N.A. FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0572 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 07/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,157.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less