This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 19:07:09 (UTC).

TAYLOR-V-BREUER

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 TAYLOR-V-BREUER was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0890

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HELENE TAYLOR

Defendant

JOHN BREUER

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; 09:14; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: HELENE TAYLOR, JOHN BREUER; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOHN BREUER WITH COSTS OF $35.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOHN BREUER WITH COSTS OF $35.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET PRINTED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET PRINTED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170522-0865 $35.00; 170522-0865-DB Reference Number 026-0044016483

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170522-0865 $35.00; 170522-0865-DB Reference Number 026-0044016483

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; 09:14; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: HELENE TAYLOR, JOHN BREUER; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOHN BREUER WITH COSTS OF $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170825-0432 $5.00; 170825-0432-DB Reference Number 026-0064368392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • REQUEST TO CONINUE HEARING BY PLA NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170522-0865 $35.00; 170522-0865-DB Reference Number 026-0044016483

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET PRINTED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less