This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 13:51:50 (UTC).

TAYLOR FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 TAYLOR FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1020

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ROBERT E TAYLOR

SAMANTHA TAYLOR HARRISON

SCOTT KAYS

Other

TAYLOR FAMILY TRUST

Trustee

ELSA B TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ORTIZ, DONNASUE

10700 Civic Center Dr Suite 100-C

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

WADE LAW GROUP

84 W Santa Clara Street Suite 750

San Jose, CA 95113

Trustee Attorney

ROTH, MITCHELL I

10535 Foothill Blvd #300

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

PETITION TRUSTEES PETITION TO DIRECT SAMANTHA T HARRISION FILED BY SCOTT KAYS(PROBATE).

PETITION TRUSTEES PETITION TO DIRECT SAMANTHA T HARRISION FILED BY SCOTT KAYS(PROBATE).

PETITION TRUSTEES PETITION TO DIRECT SAMANTHA T HARRISION FILED BY SCOTT KAYS(PROBATE).

PETITION TRUSTEES PETITION TO DIRECT SAMANTHA T HARRISION FILED BY SCOTT KAYS(PROBATE).

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY SAMANTHA TAYLOR HARRISON.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY SAMANTHA TAYLOR HARRISON.

AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER TO PETITION TO BE REMOVED AS TRUSTEE - TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS FILED.

AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER TO PETITION TO BE REMOVED AS TRUSTEE - TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS VERIFIED ANSWER BY MAIL ON 06/13/19 AS TO MITCHELL I ROTH & DONNASUE SMITH ORTIZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS VERIFIED ANSWER BY MAIL ON 06/13/19 AS TO MITCHELL I ROTH & DONNASUE SMITH ORTIZ, FILED.

HRG OF 05/06/19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/06/19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/06/19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/06/19 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVER SHEET RE: 02/25/19 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET RE: 02/25/19 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF THERESA BRAIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED

DECLARATION OF THERESA BRAIN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED

HRG OF 01/08/19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/08/19 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION FILED BY SAMANTHA TAYLOR HARRISON.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION FILED BY SAMANTHA TAYLOR HARRISON.

VEFIFICATION OF SCOTT KAYS RESPONSE & OBJECTIONS TO SAMANTHA TAYLOR HARRISONS ETC FILED.

VEFIFICATION OF SCOTT KAYS RESPONSE & OBJECTIONS TO SAMANTHA TAYLOR HARRISONS ETC FILED.

COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED.

COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED.

PETITION RE: TO COMPEL SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS FILED.

PETITION RE: TO COMPEL SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS FILED.

HRG OF 03/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/05/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/05/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/05/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/05/16 - PROBATE NOTES

PETITION (EX PARTE) OF BENEFICIARY TO SUSPEND TRUSTEE; FILED BY APPOINT TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE(PROBATE).

PETITION (EX PARTE) OF BENEFICIARY TO SUSPEND TRUSTEE; FILED BY APPOINT TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE(PROBATE).

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • HEARING RE: PETN TO DIRECT SAMANTHA HARRISON RETURN TRUST PROP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • HEARING RE: PETN TO COMPEL SUC TRUSTEE SCOTT KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • HEARING RE: TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS AMENDED ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • HEARING RE: TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS AMENDED ACCOUNTING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY SAMANTHA TAYLOR HARRISON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HEARING RE: PETN TO DIRECT SAMANTHA HARRISON RETURN TRUST PROP; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER REBECCA ALLEN 13689; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DONNASUE ORTIZ PRESENT FOR ROBERT TAYLOR.; ATTORNEY AMIEL WADE PRESENT FOR SCOTT KAYS, PRESENT.; ATTORNEY MITCHELL ROTH PRESENT FOR ELSA TAYLOR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MATTER IS CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. ON COURTS OWN MOTION, THE AMENDED ACCOUNTING; CURRENTLY SET FOR OCTOBER 1, 2019 IS ORDERED RESET TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. COURT ORDERS THAT THE; ACCOUNTING OF ROBERT E TAYLOR TO BE FILED & SERVED BY THE HEARING OF OCTOBER 8, 2019. COURT; SETS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 8, 2019.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/08/19 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HEARING RE: PETN TO COMPEL SUC TRUSTEE SCOTT KAY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER REBECCA ALLEN 13689; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DONNASUE ORTIZ PRESENT FOR ROBERT E TAYLOR.; ATTORNEY AMIEL WADE PRESENT FOR SCOTT KAYS, PRESENT.; ATTORNEY MITCHELL ROTH PRESENT FOR ELSA TAYLOR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MATTER IS CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. ON COURTS OWN MOTION, THE AMENDED ACCOUNTING; CURRENTLY SET FOR OCTOBER 1, 2019 IS ORDERED RESET TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. COURT ORDERS THAT THE; ACCOUNTING OF ROBERT E TAYLOR TO BE FILED & SERVED BY THE HEARING OF OCTOBER 8, 2019. COURT; SETS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 8, 2019.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/08/19 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HEARING RE: INJUNCTION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER REBECCA ALLEN 13689; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DONNASUE ORTIZ PRESENT FOR ROBERT E TAYLOR.; ATTORNEY AMIEL WADE PRESENT FOR SCOTT KAYS, PRESENT.; ATTORNEY MITCHELL ROTH PRESENT FOR ELSA TAYLOR.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; MATTER TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.; MATTER IS CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. ON COURTS OWN MOTION, THE AMENDED ACCOUNTING; CURRENTLY SET FOR OCTOBER 1, 2019 IS ORDERED RESET TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. COURT ORDERS THAT THE; ACCOUNTING OF ROBERT E TAYLOR TO BE FILED & SERVED BY THE HEARING OF OCTOBER 8, 2019. COURT; SETS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 8, 2019.; COURT ORDERS THAT IF THE MOTION RE DISSOLVING INJUNCTION IS SERVED & FILED BY 4PM SEPTEMBER 9,; 2019 THE CLERKS OFFICE IS ORDERED TO SET THAT MATTER FOR HEARING ON OCTOBER 8, 2019.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 10/08/19 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • HEARING RE: SCOTT KAYS ACCOUNT & REPORT; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER REBECCA ALLEN 13689; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DONNASUE ORTIZ PRESENT FOR ROBERT E TAYLOR.; ATTORNEY AMIEL WADE PRESENT FOR SCOTT KAYS, PRESENT.; ATTORNEY MITCHELL ROTH PRESENT FOR ELSA TAYLOR.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: AMENDED ACCOUNTING FILED & SET; MATTER IS CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. ON COURTS OWN MOTION, THE AMENDED ACCOUNTING; CURRENTLY SET FOR OCTOBER 1, 2019 IS ORDERED RESET TO OCTOBER 8, 2019. COURT ORDERS THAT THE; ACCOUNTING OF ROBERT E TAYLOR TO BE FILED & SERVED BY THE HEARING OF OCTOBER 8, 2019. COURT; SETS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 8, 2019.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 10/08/19 CONFIRMED.; HEARING RE: TRUSTEE SCOTT KAYS AMENDED ACCOUNTING SET FOR 10/08/19 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/01/19 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL ON 06/24/19 AS TO SEE ATTCHED LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 120516 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 101816 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SUSPENDING TRUSTEE; APPOINTING TEMP TRUSTEE ETC RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION (EX PARTE) OF BENEFICIARY TO SUSPEND TRUSTEE; FILED BY APPOINT TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE(PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON REMOVING TRUSTEE; APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE ETC RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO REMOVE TRUSTEE AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE AND FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL); Minutes; Receipt: 161012-0472 $930.00; 161012-0472-CK Reference Number 4699

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.