This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:19:57 (UTC).

TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON N JERRY HIGDON II

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON N JERRY HIGDON II was filed as a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8663

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON

Respondents and Others

JERRY HIGDON II

TARA CUMMINGS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180523-0155 $6.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY TARA CUMMINGS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHERYL C KERSEY, JUDGE; CLERK: PAULINE RODRIGUEZ; COURT REPORTER MICHELLE SWAL 13580; BAILIFF: J VILLESCAS; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON, JERRY HIGDON II; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; 08:52; NO APPEARANCE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION --DISMISSAL LACK OF PROSECUTION (FL); DISPOSITION DISMISSAL LACK OF PROSECUTION (FL); ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: LACK OF PROSECUTION.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRO/DV/ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE FILED AS TO JERRY HIGDON II. PARTY SERVED ON 04/19/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • MODIFICATION OF RESTRAINING ORDERS ENTERED INTO CLETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE NOTICED OF ORDER VIA CLETS ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY TARA CUMMINGS; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHERYL C KERSEY, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE KAZALUNAS; COURT REPORTER MICHELLE SWAL 13580; BAILIFF: J VILLESCAS; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JERRY HIGDON II; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- TARA CUMMINGS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PETITIONER, MORE TIME FOR SERVICE.; RESTRAINING ORDERS; ALL EXISTING TEMPORARY ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT UNTIL 5/23/18.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S53.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • RESTRAINING ORDERS ENTERED INTO CLETS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE NOTICED OF ORDER VIA CLETS ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)FILED BY TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2018
  • SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ORDER ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JERRY HIGDON II; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON TARA CUMMINGS-HIGDON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S53

    Read MoreRead Less