This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:01:35 (UTC).

TAPIA-V-STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 TAPIA-V-STATE OF CALIFORNIA was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6732

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELILAH TAPIA

EDUARDO TAPIA

REYNALDO TAPIA

NAOMI TAPIA

ALEJANDRO TAPIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

CITY OF HESPERIA

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

ALEJANDRO BUSTILLOS

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ALEJANDRO BUSTILLOS

ROES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

407 Bryant Circle Ste F

Ojai, CA 93023

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BORDIN SEMMER LLP

6100 Center Dr Suite 1130

Los Angeles, CA 90045

DEPUTY ATTORNEY

100 South Main Street Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/17/19 AS TO CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY DOMINGUEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/17/19 AS TO CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY DOMINGUEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/20/19 AS TO BRAVO! THERAPY & CONSULTING, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/20/19 AS TO BRAVO! THERAPY & CONSULTING, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/17/19 AS TO CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY FULLERTON, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/17/19 AS TO CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY FULLERTON, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA DOCS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/18/19 AS TO KAISER PERMANENTE, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA DOCS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/18/19 AS TO KAISER PERMANENTE, FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALEJANDRO TAPIA, DELILAH TAPIA, EDUARDO TAPIA, NAOMI TAPIA, REYNALDO TAPIA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALEJANDRO TAPIA, DELILAH TAPIA, EDUARDO TAPIA, NAOMI TAPIA, REYNALDO TAPIA.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ALEJANDRO BUSTILLOS SERVED ON 12/18/18 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ALEJANDRO BUSTILLOS SERVED ON 12/18/18 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/12/2018 OF ALEJANDRO TAPIA BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/12/2018 OF ALEJANDRO TAPIA BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

ANSWER FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DEPUTY ATTORNEY.

ANSWER FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DEPUTY ATTORNEY.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/12/2018 OF ALEJANDRO TAPIA BY CITY OF HESPERIA

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/12/2018 OF ALEJANDRO TAPIA BY CITY OF HESPERIA

ANSWER FILED BY CITY OF HESPERIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BORDIN SEMMER LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY CITY OF HESPERIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BORDIN SEMMER LLP.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/07/18 WITH COSTS OF $169.05 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/07/18 WITH COSTS OF $169.05 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF HESPERIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/18 WITH COSTS OF $219.05 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF HESPERIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/18 WITH COSTS OF $219.05 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/17/19 AS TO CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY DOMINGUEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/20/19 AS TO BRAVO! THERAPY & CONSULTING, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/17/19 AS TO CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY FULLERTON, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA DOCS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 06/18/19 AS TO KAISER PERMANENTE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LANCE BEHRINGER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALEJANDRO TAPIA, DELILAH TAPIA, EDUARDO TAPIA, NAOMI TAPIA, REYNALDO TAPIA.; ATTORNEY RUTH YEAGER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 14 DAYS; JURY DEMANDED BY BOTH PLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL.; COURT NOTES JURY FEES HAVE NOT YET BEEN PAID.; PLAINTIFF COUNSEL TO FILE DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. COURT NOTES; STIPULATION WAS FILED DISMISSING THE CITY OF HESPERIA.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS TO BE SENT BY CLERK.; IN LIGHT OF BOTH COUNSELS REPRESENTATION THAT THEY WILL PURSUE PRIVATE MEDIATION, COURT ORDERS; MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED NO LATER THAN 6/30/20.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 08/27/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 08/31/20 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 14 DAYS.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL TRIAL SETTING ORDERS TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALEJANDRO TAPIA, DELILAH TAPIA, EDUARDO TAPIA, NAOMI TAPIA, REYNALDO TAPIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALEJANDRO BUSTILLOS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/07/18 WITH COSTS OF $169.05 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ALEJANDRO BUSTILLOS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/04/18 WITH COSTS OF $169.05 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF HESPERIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/18 WITH COSTS OF $219.05 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALEJANDRO TAPIA FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 181012-0695 $435.00; 181012-0695-CK Reference Number CK 1182

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.