This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:11:53 (UTC).

TAPIA ENTERPRISES-V-DANIEL ECHEA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 TAPIA ENTERPRISES-V-DANIEL ECHEA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1751

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION

Defendant

DANIEL A ECHEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY S. SHERMAN

21112 Ventura Boulevard

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-2103

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 4224.19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 160629-0158 $25.00; 160629-0158-CK Reference Number 1523

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 160629-0157 $25.00; 160629-0157-CK Reference Number 1523

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION ORDERED ENTERED 05/06/16; JUDGMENT FOR: TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIEL A ECHEA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,067.32 INTEREST $177.84 ATTORNEY FEES $154.03 COSTS $300.00 AND DAMAGES $1,500.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,199.19; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: 1033 FILED BY TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2016
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANIEL A ECHEA SERVED ON 03/16/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-2801 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TAPIA ENTERPRISES,INC., A CORPORATION FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-2795 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less