This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 15:34:48 (UTC).

TANORI -V- CHACON

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 TANORI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHACON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1036

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIA G TANORI

MARTIN I TANORI

Defendant

SHEREE CHACON

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0590 $30.00; 170206-0590-DB Reference Number 025-0066517536

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2017
  • FOR $1149.60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • CK 3620019327 SENT TO MARIA &/OR MARTIN TANORI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SHEREE CHACON FOR PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT; Minutes; Receipt: 170421-0840 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF MARTIN TANORI ORDERED ENTERED 04/03/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MARTIN I TANORI, MARIA G TANORI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHEREE CHACON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,064.47 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,134.47; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARTIN I TANORI, MARIA G TANORI PRESENT; DEFENDANT SHEREE CHACON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:00; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- MARTIN TANORI IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- SHEREE CHACON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 11:09; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO SHEREE CHACON. PARTY SERVED ON 02/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARTIN I TANORI FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0592 $5.50; 170206-0592-DB Reference Number 025-0066517536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0590 $30.00; 170206-0590-DB Reference Number 025-0066517536

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.