This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 10:49:42 (UTC).

TANIA GALLAGHER-V-HOME DEPOT INC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 TANIA GALLAGHER-V-HOME DEPOT INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5351

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TANIA GALLAGHER

Defendants

HOME DEPOT, INC. LIFETIME SOLUTIONS, AND

HOME DEPOT, INC.

HOME DEPOT USA,INC

LIFETIME SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EMANUEL J ABRISHAMI

9454 Wilshire Blvd. Penthouse

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

DOWNTOWN L.A . LAWGROUP

3460 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

MCCUNE & HARBER

515 S. Figueroa Street Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DEF HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED.

DEF HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH DOWNTOWN L.A . LAWGROUP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR TANIA GALLAGHER.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH DOWNTOWN L.A . LAWGROUP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR TANIA GALLAGHER.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED

DECLARATION RE: ISO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED FILED BY TANIA GALLAGHER

DECLARATION RE: ISO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED FILED BY TANIA GALLAGHER

EX PARTE FOR RELIEF AS COUNSEL FILED.

EX PARTE FOR RELIEF AS COUNSEL FILED.

CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HOME DEPOT USA,INC.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HOME DEPOT USA,INC.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY HOME DEPOT USA,INC

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY HOME DEPOT USA,INC

NOTICE OF FIRST LIEN FILED.

NOTICE OF FIRST LIEN FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY HOME DEPOT USA,INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER.

ANSWER FILED BY HOME DEPOT USA,INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LIFETIME SOLUTIONS SERVED ON 11/08/16 WITH FEES OF $142.26.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LIFETIME SOLUTIONS SERVED ON 11/08/16 WITH FEES OF $142.26.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HOME DEPOT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/01/16 WITH COSTS OF $140.90 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HOME DEPOT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/01/16 WITH COSTS OF $140.90 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2017
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 9/22/17, EX PARTE HRG RE: FOR RELIEF AS COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH DOWNTOWN L.A . LAWGROUP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR TANIA GALLAGHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: FOR RELIEF AS COUNSEL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; EMANUEL J. ABRISHAMI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TANIA GALLAGHER.; ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD IS GRANTED.; EMANUEL J. ABRISHAMI IS RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF.; TANIA GALLAGHER NOW IN PRO/PER.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ISO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED FILED BY TANIA GALLAGHER

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/15/2016 OF TANIA GALLAGHER, LIFETIME SOLUTIONS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PARTY HOME DEPOT, INC. UPDATED: CORRECTED NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PLAINTIFF TANIA GALLAGHER FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TANIA GALLAGHER FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160915-0579 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.