Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 22:36:30 (UTC).

TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON -N- ROBERT ANTHONY SIMPSON

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON -N- ROBERT ANTHONY SIMPSON was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2569

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON

Respondent

ROBERT ANTHONY SIMPSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • VACATE HFAIL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/30/22 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • VACATE RSC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CHILD SUPPORT CASE REGISTRY FORM RECEIVED FROM ROBERT ANTHONY SIMPSON AND SENT TO THE DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES IN SACRAMENTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 02/20/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CHILD SUPPORT CASE REGISTRY FORM RECEIVED FROM TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON AND SENT TO THE DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES IN SACRAMENTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/29/2017 OF TAMMI SIMPSON FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/29/2017 OF TAMMI SIMPSON ORDERED ENTERED 02/20/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERI CLARK; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: M LOZANO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON, ROBERT ANTHONY SIMPSON; PROCEEDINGS:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON, ROBERT ANTHONY SIMPSON; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); HEARING ON: CASE RESOLUTION; 09:43; NO APPEARANCE.; THE COURT ACQUIRED JURISDICTION ON 04-27-2017 BY FILING OF THE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS.; NO RESPONSE.; NO PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE(S).; THE COURT HAS SET THIS MATTER FOR A FURTHER CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE, AS SET FORTH; BELOW.; THIS IS THE FIRST CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; NOTICE SENT ONLY AS TO PETITIONER. NO ADDRESS IS ON FILE AS NO RESPONSE TO THE PETITION HAS BEEN; FILED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ROBERT ANTHONY SIMPSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERI CLARK; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: M LOZANO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TAMMI RENAE SIMPSON, ROBERT ANTHONY SIMPSON; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); 08:30; NO APPEARANCE.; NO SERVICE.; NO RESPONSE.; THE COURT HAS SET THIS MATTER FOR A FURTHER CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE, AS SET FORTH; BELOW.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54.; NOTICE SENT ONLY AS TO PETITIONER. NO ADDRESS IS ON FILE AS NO RESPONSE TO THE PETITION HAS BEEN; FILED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0248 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less