This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:21:57 (UTC).

TAING -V- WEAVER

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 TAING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WEAVER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2099

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENG HAK TAING

Defendant

JESSE WEAVER

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th Street

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1129

KRASNEY, ROBERT A

362 W 6Th St

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SHERIFFS OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION -- WRIT FEE TAKEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 110613-1776 $25.00; 110613-1776-CK Reference Number 29035

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF HENG TAING ORDERED ENTERED 05/19/11; JUDGMENT FOR: HENG HAK TAING; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JESSE WEAVER; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JESSE WEAVER. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, JESSE WEAVER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF HENG TAING AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, JESSE WEAVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JESSE WEAVER; PARTY SERVED ON 05/04/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/04/11 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF HENG TAING, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4448 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF HENG TAING, JESSE WEAVER REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF HENG TAING, JESSE WEAVER IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less