This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:52:20 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY -V- TREJO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 SYNCHRONY -V- TREJO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9635

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

TRININDAD TREJO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C

4545 Murphy Canyon Road 3Rd Fl

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TRININDAD TREJO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TRININDAD TREJO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TRININDAD TREJO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF SYNCHRONY BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,758.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR 1ST APP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0434 $240.00; 171006-0434-CK Reference Number CK 708604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less