This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:35:00 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY -V- RYCZEK

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 SYNCHRONY -V- RYCZEK was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9521

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

CHARLES RYCZEK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C

4545 Murphy Canyon Road 3Rd Fl

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/SANCTIONS/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:48; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: ADDITIONAL TIME NEEDED TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740(E).; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/SANCTIONS/TSC SET FOR 07/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:49; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE SERVICE FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF SYNCHRONY BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,189.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0884 $240.00; 171004-0884-CK Reference Number 708605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less