This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:34:18 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY -V- GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 SYNCHRONY -V- GOMEZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9514

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

CLAUDIA GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C

4545 Murphy Canyon Road 3Rd Fl

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CLAUDIA GOMEZ WITH COSTS OF $67.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CLAUDIA GOMEZ WITH COSTS OF $67.50

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: 10/04/18 IS RE-ASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE: 10/04/18 IS RE-ASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CLAUDIA GOMEZ SERVED ON 03/09/18 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: SERVICE FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CLAUDIA GOMEZ WITH COSTS OF $67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF SYNCHRONY BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,353.88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0756 $240.00; 171004-0756-CK Reference Number 708598

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less