This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:27:18 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK -V- VALERIA CURTIS

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK -V- VALERIA CURTIS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9461

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

VALERIA CURTIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C

4545 Murphy Canyon Road 3Rd Fl

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VALERIA CURTIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VALERIA CURTIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VALERIA CURTIS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VALERIA CURTIS.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/02/18; JUDGMENT FOR: SYNCHRONY BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VALERIA CURTIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,214.94 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $307.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,522.44; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 2547.44 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR SAN BERNARDINO CO; Minutes; Receipt: 180502-0458 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/02/18; JUDGMENT FOR: SYNCHRONY BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VALERIA CURTIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,214.94 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $307.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,522.44; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF SYNCHRONY BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,214.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0% PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0589 $240.00; 171004-0589-CK Reference Number 708600

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less