This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:58:33 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK -V- TURCOTTE

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK -V- TURCOTTE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3231

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

JOSHUA TURCOTTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C.I.R. LLP

2650 Camino Del Rio North Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0453 $240.00; 170712-0453-CK Reference Number 701644

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTY AND ASSOCIATION FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSHUA TURCOTTE SERVED ON 09/05/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0453 $240.00; 170712-0453-CK Reference Number 701644

    Read MoreRead Less