This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:58:39 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK -V- NELSON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK -V- NELSON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3232

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

EUGENE NELSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C.I.R. LLP

2650 Camino Del Rio North Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0457 $240.00; 170712-0457-CK Reference Number 701634

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 06/11/18; JUDGMENT FOR: SYNCHRONY BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EUGENE NELSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,854.08 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $398.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,252.08; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY FEE WAIVER FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPP OF WAIVER OF INTEREST FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CRC 3.1800(A) FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK, FOR COSTS $398.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY & ASSOC OF COUNSEL FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO EUGENE NELSON WITH COSTS OF $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EUGENE NELSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0457 $240.00; 170712-0457-CK Reference Number 701634

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less