This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:47:49 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK -V- MEFFERD

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK -V- MEFFERD was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3188

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

SAMANTHA MEFFERD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C.I.R. LLP

2650 Camino Del Rio North Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0408 $240.00; 170713-0408-CK Reference Number 701783

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND ASSOCIATION FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SAMANTHA MEFFERD WITH COSTS OF $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0408 $240.00; 170713-0408-CK Reference Number 701783

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less