This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 09:00:18 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK-V-GREENE

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK-V-GREENE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3243

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

SHIRLEY GREENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIR LAW OFFICES, LLP

2650 Camino Del Rio North, Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY/ASSOCIATION FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT SHIRLEY GREENE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:20; COURT INQUIRES WITH DEFENDANT AS TO THE LOSS OF INCOME FOR HER APPEARANCE AT THE HEARING ON; 12/14/17; DEFENDANT INFORMS THE COURT SHE DOES NOT WORK AND WAS NOT IMPACTED FINANCIALLY FOR HER APPEARANCE; AT THE PREVIOUS HEARING.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY WAIVED; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; BENCH TRIAL: ORDER: EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING; PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING: [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY; PAGE-NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C )(F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR; TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN; COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS,; EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESSES.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK IS SET FOR 07/11/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:22; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; DEFENDANT SHIRLEY GREENE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:53; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO AN ADDITIONAL AMOUNT TO; COMPENSATE DEFENDANT FOR HER APPEARANCE AT TODAYS HEARING.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S17; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:54; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR SANCTIONS; Minutes; Receipt: 171129-0898 $90.00; 171129-0898-CK Reference Number 42633

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; CIR LAW OFFICES, LLP FOR SYNCHRONY BANK NOT PRESENT; DEFENDANT SHIRLEY GREENE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:10; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL(FAILURE TO APPEAR TODAY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $90.00 PAYABLE TO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 11/27/17.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL(FAILURE TO APPEAR TODAY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $150.00 PAYABLE TO DEFENDANT SHIRLEY GREENE ON OR BEFORE 11/27/17.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/14/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:11; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170818-0877 $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • PLAINTIFF SYNCHRONY BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,099.82

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0408 $240.00; 170712-0408-CK Reference Number 701638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less