This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:47:26 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK-V-BILLINGS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SYNCHRONY BANK-V-BILLINGS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3185

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

STEPHANIE BILLINGS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C.I.R. LLP

2650 Camino Del Rio North Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

CIRC LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

2650 Camino Del Rio North Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180213-0517 $25.00; 180213-0517-CK Reference Number 602203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: JUDGMENT CCP 585D FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF SYNCHRONY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 11/13/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SYNCHRONY BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: STEPHANIE BILLINGS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,591.79 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $319.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,910.79; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK, FOR 319.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND STATEMENTS FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: ATTY FEE WAIVER FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEPHANIE BILLINGS SERVED ON 08/01/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,591.79

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 07/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0812 $240.00; 170712-0812-CK Reference Number 701762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less