This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2018 at 10:37:50 (UTC).

SY VENTURES V -V- AMERICAN MERCHANDISE INC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 SY VENTURES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against -V- AMERICAN MERCHANDISE INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4500

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SY VENTURES V LLC

Defendants

YAYUAN C YUAN

AMERICAN MERCHANDISE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEWLEY, LASSLEBEN & MILLER

13215 E Penn St., Suite 510

Whittier, CA 90602

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2012
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE FURTHER HEARING ON CONTEMPT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT L SKOPHAMMER; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO APPEARANCE.; COURT FINDS:; HEARING IS DISMISSED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; COURT SETS OSC RE: FURTHER HEARING ON CONTEMPT ON 11/9/12 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT R8.; COURT ORDERS SY VENTURES TO GIVE PERSONAL SERVICE OF THE HEARING.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE FURTHER HEARING ON CONTEMPT SET FOR 11/09/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 101012 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AS TO YAYUAN C. YUAN; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA ALANIZ; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; BAILIFF: T ORTEGA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR BEWLEY, LASSLEBEN & MILLER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 08:39; PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS TO THE COURT THE DEFENDANT HAS BEEN SERVED AND NOTIFIED OF TODAYS DATE.; PLAINTIFF SUBMITS ON PLEADINGS.; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AS TO AMERICAN MERCHANDISE; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA ALANIZ; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; BAILIFF: T ORTEGA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR BEWLEY, LASSLEBEN & MILLER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 08:39; PLAINTIFF SUBMITS ON PLEADINGS.; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/07/12 AS TO YAYUAN C YUAN, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SY VENTURES V LLC FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 120831-1870 $19.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY YAYUAN C YUAN FOR COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 120831-1126 $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SY VENTURES V LLC FOR COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 120831-1049 $2.00; 120831-1049-CK Reference Number 340143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • NO SASE PROVIDED FOR ORDERS; PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: APP FOR OSC RE: CONTEMPT AS TO YAYUAN C. YUAN; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA ALANIZ; COURT REPORTER JILL LANGLEY 7663; BAILIFF: T ORTEGA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR BEWLEY, LASSLEBEN & MILLER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : CONTEMPT AS TO YAYUAN C. YUAN SET FOR 09/19/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; CONTEMPT NEEDS TO BE PERSONALLY SERVED.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF SY VENTURES V LLC AS TO AMERICAN MERCHANDISE INC, YAYUAN C YUAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/03/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO YAYUAN C YUAN SERVED ON 05/06/11 WITH FEES OF $52.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ON SUB SERVICE NEED TO SHOW THREE DIFFERENT DATES SERVICE WAS ATTEMPT..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMERICAN MERCHANDISE INC SERVED ON 05/06/11 WITH FEES OF $52.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/04/2011 OF SY VENTURES V LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-0083 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less