This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:10:50 (UTC).

SUNBELT RENTALS INC -V- SE WELCO INC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 SUNBELT RENTALS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SE WELCO INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9425

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNBELT RENTALS INC

Defendants

SHANNON COUSER

S.E. WELCO INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

106 South Mentor Ave Ste 150

Pasadena, CA 91106

 

Court Documents

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SUNBELT RENTALS INC ORDERED ENTERED 01/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: SUNBELT RENTALS INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: S.E. WELCO INC.,, SHANNON COUSER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $41,881.42 INTEREST $7,454.65 ATTORNEY FEES $2,456.44 COSTS $682.09 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $52,474.60; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RQST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET BY MAIL ON 12/27/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RQST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET BY MAIL ON 12/27/17 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SUNBELT RENTALS INC AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SUNBELT RENTALS INC AS TO DOES ONLY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON S.E. WELCO INC.,, SHANNON COUSER.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON S.E. WELCO INC.,, SHANNON COUSER.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST S.E. WELCO INC., FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST S.E. WELCO INC., FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHANNON COUSER FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHANNON COUSER FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO S.E. WELCO INC., SERVED ON 10/31/17 WITH FEES OF $165.09.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO S.E. WELCO INC., SERVED ON 10/31/17 WITH FEES OF $165.09.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SHANNON COUSER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $82.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SHANNON COUSER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $82.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0334 $435.00; 171004-0334-CK Reference Number 62923

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 54527.18 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180605-0961 $25.00; 180605-0961-CK Reference Number 67138

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,027.58)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SUNBELT RENTALS INC FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180122-0163 $25.00; 180122-0163-CK Reference Number 64721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 01/15/18 AS TO S.E. WELCO IN., A CORPORATION, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SUNBELT RENTALS INC ORDERED ENTERED 01/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: SUNBELT RENTALS INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: S.E. WELCO INC.,, SHANNON COUSER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $41,881.42 INTEREST $7,454.65 ATTORNEY FEES $2,456.44 COSTS $682.09 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $52,474.60; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHANNON COUSER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF SUNBELT RENTALS INC AS TO SHANNON COUSER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO S.E. WELCO INC., SERVED ON 10/31/17 WITH FEES OF $165.09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SHANNON COUSER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $82.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0334 $435.00; 171004-0334-CK Reference Number 62923

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less