This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:29:34 (UTC).

SUDDS, ETAL -V- PARKER, ETAL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 SUDDS, ETAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PARKER, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6201

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SYLVIA SUDDS

CHARLES SUDDS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ROBERT PATRICK PARKER

ISAAC MARTIN GOMEZ

ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS

AMY L PARKER

SARA GOMEZ

SARAH GOMEZ

ITM ARTIFICAL GRASS

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ISAAC MARTIN GOMEZ

AMY L PARKER

SARAH GOMEZ

ITM ARITIFICAL GRASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNEZ LAW GROUP LLP

6780 Indiana Ave Ste 150

Riverside, CA 92506

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

501 W Broadway Suite 2060

San Diego, CA 92101

WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1111 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite 113

Palm Springs, CA 92262

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center

Long Beach, CA 76652

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL RE SPESCIAL AND FORM INTERROGS SET FOR HEARING ON 08/19/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL RE SPESCIAL AND FORM INTERROGS SET FOR HEARING ON 08/19/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL RE REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 08/19/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL RE REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION SET FOR HEARING ON 08/19/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS (IMAGED)

ANSWER FILED BY ROBERT PATRICK PARKER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

ANSWER FILED BY ROBERT PATRICK PARKER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS.

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS.

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED.

DEMURRER FILED BY ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS; REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS; REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR(IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FAC SET FOR HEARING ON 07/17/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FAC SET FOR HEARING ON 07/17/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICAL GRASS. PARTY SERVED ON 03/28/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICAL GRASS. PARTY SERVED ON 03/28/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

ANSWER FILED BY ISAAC MARTIN GOMEZ, SARAH GOMEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WINET PATRICK GAYERCREIGHTON &HANES.

ANSWER FILED BY ISAAC MARTIN GOMEZ, SARAH GOMEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WINET PATRICK GAYERCREIGHTON &HANES.

DEMURRER FILED BY ROBERT PATRICK PARKER; REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY ROBERT PATRICK PARKER; REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR(IMAGED)

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2018 OF CHARLES SUDDS BY AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2018 OF CHARLES SUDDS BY AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OR POSTING OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS.; Minutes; Receipt: 190308-0248 $20.00; 190308-0248-CK Reference Number 2072

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO PRODUCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLTFS FURTHER SEP STMENT ISO MOTION TO COMPEL RE INTEROGS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • REPLY TO ISO TO MOTION RE: COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES INTEROGS SET FOR HEARING ON 08/19/19 FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO ISO TO MOTION RE: COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/19/19 FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLTFS FURTHER STATMENT ISO MOTION TO COMPEL RFP SET 1 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO ISO TO MOTION RE: COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON 08/19/19 FILED BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY FRED KNEZ APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS.; ATTORNEY JOHN PEARSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ROBERT PATRICK PARKER, AMY L PARKER, ITM ARTIFICIAL GRASS.; ATTORNEY PUAL BURKHART APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ISAAC MARTIN GOMEZ, SARAH GOMEZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; TRIAL DATES TO BE SET ON CONTINUED DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2018 OF CHARLES SUDDS, SARAH GOMEZ IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • PLAINTIFF CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 181009-1042 $13.71; 181009-1042-MC Reference Number 0330090490860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHARLES SUDDS, SYLVIA SUDDS FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 181009-1040 $435.00; 181009-1040-MC Reference Number 0330090490860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.