This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 10:08:39 (UTC).

STURGEON VS COULTER

Case Summary

On 06/02/2010 STURGEON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COULTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0558

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDRA STURGEON

Defendant

WALTER COULTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2012
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 08/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF HEARING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • ALL PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR IN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT WALTER COULTER.; Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/02/2010 OF SANDRA STURGEON ORDERED SET ASIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • RCVD ORDER SIGNED BY PRO TEM HARRIS TO SET A HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • FAXED COPY OF REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION RECEIVED & REQUEST SENT TO F2/HEARING OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER RECEIV ED FROM FONTANA COURT.; Minutes; COURT ORDERS A HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SANDRA STURGEON FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 100709-1674 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100709-1672 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • ORDER GRANTING POSTPONEMENT FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL SMALL CLAIMS HEARING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000; Minutes; Receipt: 100602-1023 $75.00; 100602-1023-CK Reference Number 4355

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.