Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/02/2018 at 00:10:05 (UTC).

STUART VS ENNIS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2010 STUART filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ENNIS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2512

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIAN T STUART

Defendant

THERESE ENNIS

 

Court Documents

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED. REQUEST IS SET FOR HEARING. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED. REQUEST IS SET FOR HEARING. (IMAGED)

ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY BRIAN T STUART (IMAGED)

ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY BRIAN T STUART (IMAGED)

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

STIPULATION RE: AGREEMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: AGREEMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTF CLAIM FILED AS TO THERESE ENNIS. PARTY SERVED ON 10/26/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $45.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTF CLAIM FILED AS TO THERESE ENNIS. PARTY SERVED ON 10/26/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $45.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100929-1358 $50.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2013
  • OSC RE: JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL FILED BY 06/07/13; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS MOTION HEARING RE: REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BRIAN T STUART PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: THERESE ENNIS; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; 01:55; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY BRIAN STUART .; AFTER ARGUMENT,; THE REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL THE JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY THE DEFENDANT; IS DENIED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED. REQUEST IS SET FOR HEARING. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • FAXED SIGNED ORDER TO RANCHO CIVIL-PER BENCH OFFICERS REQUEST FONTANA TO KEEP FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY BRIAN T STUART (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110311-0552 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110310-1267 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • MAILED RQST TO CORRECT/CANCEL JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF, BRIAN T. STUART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2011
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: TO ALLOW JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED FILED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/29/2010 OF BRIAN STUART ORDERED ENTERED 02/09/11; JUDGMENT FOR: BRIAN T STUART; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THERESE ENNIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,000.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: AGREEMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LESLIE E MURAD, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: TANYA PIRDY; BAILIFF: MIKE RODES; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BRIAN T STUART PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; 08:41; THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE VENUE ONTARIO IS PROPER.; BRIAN STUART IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION:; 08:53; DEFENDANT THERESE ENNIS PRESENT; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; 10:46; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL SET FOR 06/07/13 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCF.; AGREEMENT LODGED IN THE COURT FILE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BRIAN T STUART PRESENT; DEFENDANT THERESE ENNIS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DEFENDANT WILL NOT STIPULATE TO THE HEARING OFFICER; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/19/10 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F4.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTES DATED 11/10/2010 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTF CLAIM FILED AS TO THERESE ENNIS. PARTY SERVED ON 10/26/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $45.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 024-0100482388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100929-1358 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less