This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:08:27 (UTC).

STRATA SERRANO -V- WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 STRATA SERRANO -V- WILLIAMS was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4699

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRATA SERRANO LLC

Defendant

LARRY WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LARRY WILLIAMS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LARRY WILLIAMS.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0100 $255.00; 170718-0100-CK Reference Number 535888

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF STRATA SERRANO LLC ORDERED ENTERED 07/20/14; JUDGMENT FOR: STRATA SERRANO LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LARRY WILLIAMS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: LARRY WILLIAMS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFF BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFF BIN)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LARRY WILLIAMS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/14/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LARRY WILLIAMS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/14/17

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • DECLARATION OF LOST OR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF STRATA SERRANO LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: STRATA SERRANO LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LARRY WILLIAMS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,123.50 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $480.00 AND DAMAGES $3,184.44.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,287.94; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 09/06/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $480.00, ATTORNEY FEES $500.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF STRATA SERRANO LLC ORDERED ENTERED 07/20/14; JUDGMENT FOR: STRATA SERRANO LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LARRY WILLIAMS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: LARRY WILLIAMS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LARRY WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF STRATA SERRANO LLC AS TO LARRY WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LARRY WILLIAMS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $46.83.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,123.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0100 $255.00; 170718-0100-CK Reference Number 535888

    Read MoreRead Less