This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:20:39 (UTC).

STEWART TILLETT - TAMIKA TILLETT

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 STEWART TILLETT - TAMIKA TILLETT was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8397

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEWART TILLETT

Respondent

TAMIKA TILLETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY STEWART TILLETT RE: CC/CV (092717); Disposition: Dismissed; Minutes; KHYMBERLI S APALOO, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM HARMON; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; BAILIFF: A KAMMIEN; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER STEWART TILLETT PRESENT; RESPONDENT TAMIKA TILLETT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE// IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; FAMILY COURT SERVICES REPORT FILED.; MOTHER NO SHOW FOR FCS APPOINTMENT; BY AGREEMENT OF BOTH PARTIES; REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; REACHED AN AGREEMENT OUT OF COURT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT: S47, MOM NO SHOW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TAMIKA TILLETT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS FILE SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPOINTMENT 11/6/17 @ 8:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • STEWART TILLETT IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REFERRAL TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY STEWART TILLETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY STEWART TILLETT IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON STEWART TILLETT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES/RFO IN THE AMOUNT OF $525.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY STEWART TILLETT RE: CC/CV (092717).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY STEWART TILLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less