Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 01:14:54 (UTC).

STEVEN LA BELLA -V- GMAC MORTGAGE

Case Summary

On 02/09/2012 STEVEN LA BELLA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GMAC MORTGAGE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1039

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVEN LA BELLA

Defendants

GMAC MORTGAGE LLC

GMAC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

RESIDENTIAL FUNDING CORPORATION

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN

CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL

GREENPOINT MORTGAGE

EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICE

US BANK N A

GMAC - RESIDENTIALFNDG C

EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES, LLC

GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SEVERSON & WERSON

19100 Von Karman, Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVEN LA BELLA FOR COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 121005-1669 $26.50; 121005-1669-CK Reference Number 351681

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • LEGAL RESEARCH MEMORANDUM - FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • ORDER ON DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • MOTION RE: (7/6/12) DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RESIDENTIAL FUNDINGCORPORATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, US BANK N A, GMAC - RESIDENTIALFNDG C, GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC, EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES, LLC; Disposition: Sustained; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA ALANIZ; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF STEVEN LA BELLA PRESENT; ATTORNEY BEN A. EILENBERG PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; RESIDENTIAL FUNDINGCORPORATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, US BANK N A, GMAC - RESIDENTIALFNDG C, GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC, EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEARD.; THE COURT ISSUES A TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; DEMURRER SUSTAINED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF STEVEN LA BELLA WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.; ON MAY 22, 2012, THE COURT SUSTAINED, WITH 30 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND, DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO; PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, WHICH CONTAINED TWO CAUSES OF ACTION - FRAUD AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF.; PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDS NINE NEW CAUSES OF ACTION THAT WERE NOT CONTAINED IN THE; ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND ADDS NEW DEFENDANTS. THESE AMENDMENTS ARE IMPROPER BECAUSE THEY WERE; NOT WITHIN THE SCOPE OF THE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND.; FURTHERMORE, PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THIS DEMURRER IS IDENTICAL TO THE OPPOSITION HE FILED; IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST DEMURRER. IT OFFERS NO NEW SUBSTANTIVE ARGUMENTS REGARDING; THE CAUSES OF ACTION FOR FRAUD AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF, AND IT DOES NOT EVEN ADDRESS THE; DEMURRER TO THE NINE NEW CAUSES OF ACTION. IN ESSENCE, THE DEMURRER TO THE NINE NEW CAUSES OF; ACTION IS UNOPPOSED.; ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT RESIDENTIAL FUNDINGCORPORATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, US BANK N A, GMAC - RESIDENTIALFNDG C, GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC, EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES, LLC WITH PREJUDICE.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA ALANIZ; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF STEVEN LA BELLA PRESENT; ATTORNEY BEN A. EILENBERG PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL, GREENPOINT MORTGAGE WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • MOTION RE: EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS FILED BY DEFENDANTS; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA ALANIZ; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF STEVEN LA BELLA PRESENT; ATTORNEY BEN A. EILENBERG PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; RESIDENTIAL FUNDINGCORPORATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, US BANK N A, GMAC - RESIDENTIALFNDG C, GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC, EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS IS HEARD.; THE COURT ISSUES ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; PLAINTIFF SUBMITS ON PLEADINGS.; DEFENDANT SUBMITS ON PLEADINGS.; COURT FINDS:; RESIDENTIAL FUNDINGCORPORATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, US BANK N A, GMAC - RESIDENTIALFNDG C, GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC, EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS IS GRANTED.; PLAINTIFF HAS NOT ESTABLISHED THAT HE MAILED A COPY OF THE LIS PENDENS TO ANY OF THE; DEFENDANTS, AS REQUIRED BY CCP SECTION 405.22, PRIOR TO RECORDING IT WITH THE SAN BERNARDINO; COUNTY RECORDERS OFFICE.; ADDITIONALLY, THE COURTS RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WARRANT; THE GRANT OF THIS MOTION.; THE JUDICIAL APPROVAL FOR RECORDATION, DATED MARCH 16, 2012, IS VACATED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: ISO DEFTS DEMURRER 1ST A/C;MTN TO EXPUNGE LIS PEND SET FOR HEARING ON 10/03/12, FILED BY DEFENDANT RESIDENTIAL FUNDINGCORPORATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, GMAC - RESIDENTIALFNDG C (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2012
  • DEMURRER FILED BY GMAC MORTGAGE LLC; REPRESENTED BY SEVERSON & WERSON; Minutes; Receipt: 120308-3013 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (R10) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/09/2012 OF STEVEN LA BELLA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY STEVEN LA BELLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY STEVEN LA BELLA IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON STEVEN LA BELLA FOR FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R10

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREENPOINT MORTGAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW is a litigant

Latest cases where RESIDENTIAL FUNDING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant